FL H7007 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information obtained from payment of tolls & associated charges; provides for retroactive application of exemption; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Payment of Tolls and Associated Charges
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#477 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#477 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-217 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-25 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 616 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-03-19 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-03-12 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/03/14, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-02-11 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 02/11/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0616 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2014-217)