FL H7015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes smoking of medical marijuana for qualified patient, other than terminally ill patient, under certain circumstances; prohibits smoking of medical marijuana for qualified patient under 18 years; requires certain medical marijuana treatment centers to comply with certain standards in production & packaging of marijuana in form for smoking; renames Coalition for Medical Marijuana Research & Education as Consortium for Medical Marijuana Clinical Outcomes Research; establishes consortium within state university designated by BOG.
Title
Medical Use of Marijuana
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Health and Human Services Committee | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] | Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1) |
2019-03-13 | House | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 182 |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/13/19 |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-02-21 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 1 |
2019-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/21/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S182 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Chapter No. 2019-1
S372 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
S1322 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
H7117 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S372 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
S1322 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
H7117 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 4351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |