FL H7019 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-135
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-135
Summary
Creates Mortgage Guaranty Trust Fund within OFR of DFS; provides for sources of funds & purposes; provides for annual carryforward of funds; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
Mortgage Guaranty Trust Fund/OFR [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Chapter No. 2010-135 | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01288 | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01050; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01050 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00931; Substituted for SB 1228 -SJ 00931; Read 2nd time -SJ 00931 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00880; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00880 | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01043; Passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0 -HJ 01043 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00894 | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable by- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00662; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00662 | |
2010-04-07 | On Council agenda-- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development, 04/09/10, 9:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00148 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1228 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00931; Substituted HB 7019 -SJ 00931; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7019 (Ch. 2010-135) -SJ 00931
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=7019&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |