FL H7021 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises persons authorized to register late to vote.
Title
Late Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57) |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7013 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-57
S0600 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0600 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7021 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7021/BillText/Filed/PDF |