FL H7021 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for licensure of recovery care centers by AHCA; adds recovery care centers to entities licensed, registered, or certified by agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovery Care Center Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-20HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced
2020-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H827 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback