FL H7029 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that simulating firearm or weapon while playing or wearing certain clothing or accessories is not grounds for disciplinary action or referral to criminal justice or juvenile justice system; provides criteria for determining whether certain student conduct warrants disciplinary action; provides criteria for determining appropriate consequences for conduct.
Title
Code of Student Conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#482 (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#482 (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-219 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-25 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 6 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1060 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Education; Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Education; Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed; YEAS 98 NAYS 17 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/19/14 |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/06/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Education Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1060 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7029 (Ch. 2014-219)