FL H7031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to adopt rules implementing specified federal program; revises licensure requirements for certain professions under authority of DOH; provides adverse incident reporting requirements for certain dental professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
2019-04-10HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S188 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
H247 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H509 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S884 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1078 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H6067 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H851 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-152

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3814018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46600673Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94542Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback