FL H7031 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replaces incorrect cross-references & citations; corrects grammatical, typographical, & like errors; removes inconsistencies, redundancies, & unnecessary repetition in statutes; & improves clarity of statutes & facilitates their correct interpretation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 596
2020-01-29HouseSubstituted SB 596
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-20HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced
2020-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S596 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-2

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100479Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100663Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1013735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11231455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1420195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633178Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
177503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
186801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2113103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252365Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
265707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2822205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28709451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
295016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
295017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
298225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3165501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3208225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3208251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
335067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
350113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
369305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734592Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3792291Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379366Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379372Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38102035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3832162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394499Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39540Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4038163Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403854Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4087057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409964Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4300402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
482227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
526143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
534041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55379Amended CodeSee Bill Text
553791Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62440711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626785Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62699175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626992Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
636228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69527Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7681326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
774203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
810011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
843085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback