FL H7033 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and amends provisions that have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration & may be omitted from 2020 Florida Statutes only through reviser's bill duly enacted by Legislature.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 598 |
2020-01-29 | House | Substituted SB 598 |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20 |
2020-01-20 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S598 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-3
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
427 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7033 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7033/BillText/Filed/PDF |