FL H7035 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Conforms Florida Statutes to directive of Legislature in s. 9, ch. 2012-116, LOF, codified as s. 11.242(5)(j), F.S., to prepare reviser's bill to omit all statutes & laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 600
2020-01-29HouseSubstituted SB 600
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-20HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced
2020-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S600 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-4

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
250115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
260017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback