FL H7037 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1794 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1794 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions related to constitutional amendments including requirements of the Secretary of State, signature verification for initiative petitions, Supreme Court advisory opinion, petition collector registration, signature validity, petition forms, cost of signature verification, timelines for signature verification, requirements of the Financial Impact Estimating Conference, ballot statements, & availability of amendments at polling stations.
Title
Constitutional Amendments
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House State Affairs Committee | Rep. James Grant [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] |
Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1794 passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 10 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1764 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1820 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1794 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-15
S1820 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1794 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-15
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |