FL H7053 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certified nursing assistants & home health aides to perform tasks delegated by registered nurses under certain conditions; requires entities that authorize such delegation to ensure certain requirements are met; authorizes autonomous practice for specified health care practitioners; requires Board of Health or DOH to register physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse if applicant meets criteria; authorizes such autonomous health care practitioners to perform specified acts without physician supervision or supervisory protocol; provides appropriations & authorizes positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#564 (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06SenateReceived
2020-03-06SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateIn Messages
2020-03-06HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 96 NAYS 10
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (147067, 232561)
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (295767, 670923)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed
2020-02-14HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-13HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced
2020-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1676 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 607
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H211 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed
H471 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S344 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-73
S584 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976793Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400488Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400489Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400490Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009974Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009976Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4642035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7443675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback