FL H7059 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to waive fees for birth certificates issued to certain juvenile offenders; providing criteria for a child to be a prolific juvenile offender; requiring the court to place a prolific juvenile offender in certain detention care under a special detention order until disposition, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#441 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#329 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26 Chapter No. 2017-164
2017-06-23 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-05HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2017-05-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2017-05-05HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (678252)
2017-05-02HouseIn returning messages
2017-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 1
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (678252)
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1670
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2017-04-28SenateIn Messages
2017-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time 960
2017-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time 930
2017-04-24HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-20HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/20/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-04-07HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-04-05HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-04-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-03HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2017-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-03-09HouseIntroduced
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1670 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164)
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3820255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98527Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985514Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Amendment/230689/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Amendment/190575/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Amendment/678252/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Vote/HouseVote_h07059c2329.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Vote/SenateVote_h07059c2007.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/7059/Vote/HouseVote_h07059c2441.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback