FL H7063 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF to establish Office of Quality & apply performance metrics; provides & revises provisions relating to child welfare, including duties of community alliances, sheriffs providing certain services, contracted attorneys, & lead agencies; revises provisions relating to contracts; creates & provides requirements for the Children's Promise tax credit; authorizes tax credit for certain contributions; requires analyses, proposals, & implementation of certain programs & curriculums.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-11HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-10HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time 749
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/02/20, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-14HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-13HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2020-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/11/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S122 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-152
H7039 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-144
S1348 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2110252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201876Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4027305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409997Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5611212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62451056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback