FL H7065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to mental health assistance allocation, FortifyFL, & school safety provisions relating to Commissioner of Education, OIG, Office of Safe Schools, charter schools, school districts, threat assessment teams, safe-school officers, Florida Safe Schools Assessment Tool, & DOE; provides requirements for family reunification plans & civil citation or similar prearrest diversion programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#542 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#541 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#515 (Y: 45 N: 68 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in returning Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-13HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-13SenateRefused to recede, requests House to concur
2020-03-13SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-13HouseRefused to concur, requested Senate to recede
2020-03-13HouseRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (880876)
2020-03-13HouseTemporarily postponed, on Senate message list
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (880876)
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (610278)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 7040
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (975407)
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseAmendment(s) failed (174229)
2020-03-03HouseAmendment(s) adopted (238907, 327605, 550583)
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2020-02-13HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/11/20, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2020-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H945 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
S1440 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 945
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S7040 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065
H883 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1029 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10061493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943687Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98512Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/BillText/e2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Amendment/099853/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Amendment/479247/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Amendment/609139/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Amendment/547193/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Amendment/797559/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Vote/HouseVote_h07065c1515.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Vote/HouseVote_h07065e1541.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Vote/HouseVote_h07065e1542.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7065/Vote/SenateVote_h07065e2040.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback