FL H7067 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1780; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1780 (Ch. 2010-3) -HJ 00229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopts Florida Statutes 2010 & designates portions thereof that are to constitute official law of state; provides that Florida Statutes 2010 shall be effective immediately upon publication; provides that general laws enacted during 2009 regular session & prior thereto & not included in Florida Statutes 2010 are repealed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official Florida Statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1780; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1780 (Ch. 2010-3) -HJ 00229
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Calendar -HJ 00152
2010-03-01 Referred to Calendar
2010-02-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1780 (Similar To) 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-3

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00112421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00112422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00112424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00112425Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback