FL H7067 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Terminates specified trust funds within DOT; provides for disposition of balances in & revenues of such trust funds; prescribes procedures for termination of such trust funds; repeals provisions which create Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund within DOT & prescribes sources of funds; repeals provisions relating to deposit of specified proceeds accrued pursuant to Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act, to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Termination/DOT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#698 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Budget
2012-03-05 Referred to Budget -SJ 836
2012-03-05 Received -SJ 836
2012-02-14 In Messages
2012-02-09 Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 554
2012-02-09 Read 3rd time -HJ 554
2012-02-08 Placed on 3rd reading
2012-02-08 Read 2nd time -HJ 531
2012-02-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/12
2012-02-02 Placed on Calendar -HJ 458
2012-02-01 Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 458
2012-01-30 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/01/12, 11:00 am, Webster Hall
2012-01-26 Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 297
2012-01-25 Introduced -HJ 277
2012-01-25 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
339082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback