FL H7067 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 686 (Ch. 2013-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts Florida Statutes 2013 & designates portions thereof that are to constitute official law of state; provides that Florida Statutes 2013 shall be effective immediately upon publication; provides that general laws enacted during 2012 special session "B" & prior thereto & not included in Florida Statutes 2013 are repealed; provides that general laws enacted during 2013 regular session are not repealed by this adoption act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official Florida Statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 686 (Ch. 2013-13)
2013-03-21HouseSubstituted SB 686
2013-03-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13
2013-03-13HouseReferred to Calendar
2013-03-11HouseIntroduced
2013-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0686 (Same As) 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-13

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112425Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback