FL H7067 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 676 (Ch. 2014-42)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Re-creates Welfare Transition Trust Fund within DOE without modification; abrogates provisions relating to termination of trust fund, to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Re-creation/Welfare Transition Trust Fund/DOE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 676 (Ch. 2014-42)
2014-04-01HouseSubstituted SB 676
2014-03-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/14
2014-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-03-13HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0
2014-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/13/14, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0676 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-42

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001283Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback