FL H7067 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements of state & local governments relating to transportation concurrency & impact fees & economic development incentives including Capital Investment Tax Credit, defense contractor & space flight business tax refund program, qualified target industry program, high-impact businesses, Quick Action Closing Fund, Innovation Incentive Program, and brownfield redevelopment; repeals funding relating to certain entertainment facilities; provides requirements for EFI; revises authority of FDFC; creates Startup Florida Initiative; establishes local enterprise zone program; provides for DEO certification & redesignates specified enterprise zones as certified enterprise zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#278 (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 82 NAYS 34
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (025909, 156983, 273977, 684279, 698913, 703997)
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-20HouseCS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
2015-03-31HouseNow in Economic Affairs Committee
2015-03-31HouseFavorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2015-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall --Not considered
2015-03-19HouseIntroduced
2015-03-17HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0903 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S1214 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
S1556 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H5401 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
H0063 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H0973 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
S0404 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
S0824 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1216 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-30

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
159803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1632517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16331801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28705712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28811621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28811625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28811631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889937Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/056267/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/869169/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/858211/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/703997/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/273977/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/698913/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/684279/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/156983/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/025909/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/611903/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/540294/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Amendment/307218/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7067/Vote/HouseVote_h7067e1278.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback