FL H7067 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7030 (Ch. 2016-49)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of public records & meetings exemptions for certain information related to competitive solicitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Competitive Solicitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-23HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7030 (Ch. 2016-49)
2016-02-23HouseSubstituted SB 7030
2016-02-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16
2016-01-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2016-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/28/16, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2016-01-21HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2016-01-14HouseIntroduced
2016-01-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7030 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-49

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2860113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback