FL H7067 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "proprietary business information" as used in exemption from public record requirements relating to information provided by title insurance agencies & insurers to OIR; removes scheduled repeal of exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Review Under the Open Government Sunset Review Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24 Chapter No. 2017-34
2017-05-23 Approved by Governor
2017-05-08 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-19SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 7024
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-19SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-04-04SenateReceived
2017-03-31SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-03-29SenateIn Messages
2017-03-23HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2017-03-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-03-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-16HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2017-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/16/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-10HouseIntroduced
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7024 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7067 (Ch. 2017-34)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62684195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback