FL H7067 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes & directs Governor, in cooperation with Seminole Tribe of Florida, to execute new compact in certain form; requires Division of Pari-Mutuel Wagering to revoke permit to conduct pari-mutuel wagering for permitholder that fails to make specified payments or obtain operating license; prohibits division from issuing license to conduct or authorize slot machine gaming after specified date; prohibits specified cardroom games; revises definition of term "slot machine or device".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#758 (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Conference Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-08HouseConference Committee appointed: Conference Committee on Gaming: Representatives La Rosa (Chair), Geller, Moskowitz, Rodrigues, Massullo, Grant, M., Raschein, Fine;
2018-03-08SenateConference Committee appointed: Conference Committee on Gaming: Hutson (Chair), Benacquisto, Powell;
2018-03-08SenateBill placed in Conference (Conference Committee on Gaming)
2018-03-08HouseBill placed in Conference (Conference Committee on Gaming)
2018-03-08HouseRefused to concur acceded to request for conference committee
2018-03-08HouseRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (294316) 1101
2018-03-07HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-07SenateRequests House concur or failing to concur appoint conference cmte
2018-03-07SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 10
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (294316) 871
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 840
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed; YEAS 70 NAYS 40 850
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) failed (684619)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 11
2018-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced
2018-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1367 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S840 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067
S1770 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
285710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84916Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback