FL H7067 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires an out-of-state health care provider to pay an application fee and biennial renewal fee to be registered to provide telehealth services in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#69 (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-29SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 3
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 3
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-18HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-18HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2
2019-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/18/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H23 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback