FL H7077 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes specified persons to petition court for forensic analysis that may result in evidence of identity of perpetrator or accomplice to crime resulting in conviction; requires court to make specified findings before ordering forensic analysis; requires forensic analysis to be performed by FDLE; requires FDLE to submit DNA profile to certain DNA databases; requires results to be provided to specified parties; authorizes order for search for physical evidence reported to be missing or destroyed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsentencing Forensic Analysis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#644 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10SenateReceived
2020-03-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2020-03-10SenateIn Messages
2020-03-10HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (027751, 150231) 830
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-26HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-02-18HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntroduced
2020-02-05HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
92511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9433251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback