FL H7085 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Removing a reporting requirement to the Legislature; providing timeframes in which case plans must be filed with the court and provided to specified parties; providing that efforts to preserve or reunify a family are not required under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependency Proceedings and Child Protection Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#637 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HousePassed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (270115) 938
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-10HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-07HouseIntroduced
2020-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H43 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1748 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S122 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63082Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback