FL H7097 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates Juvenile Justice Standards & Training Commission; provides that DJJ rather than commission is responsible for DJJ program staff development & training; details minimum qualifications for program staff of DJJ & contract providers who deliver direct-care services to children.
Title
Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0600 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-23 | In Messages | |
2010-03-18 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00329; Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00329 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00296 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 00267 | |
2010-03-10 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00254 |
Same As/Similar To
H0895 (Similar To) 2010-03-09 - Withdrawn from Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn from further consideration -HJ 00229
S1864 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
S1864 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0985 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |