FL H7097 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises applicability of certain definitions regarding state group insurance program; defines term "plan year"; authorizes program to include additional benefits; authorizes employee to use certain portion of state's contribution to purchase additional & supplemental benefits; provides for program to offer health plans in specified benefit coverage levels; provides for DMS to develop plan for implementation of benefit levels; provides reporting requirements; authorizes additional benefits to be included in program; provides that DMS shall contract with at least one entity that provides comprehensive pricing & inclusive services for surgery & other medical procedures; provides contract & reporting requirements; provides for DMS to establish 3-year price transparency pilot project in certain areas of state; provides project & reporting requirements; directs DMS to contract with independent benefits consultant; provides requirements for & duties of consultant; provides reporting requirement; directs DMS to provide premium alternatives to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides criteria for calculating premium alternatives; establishes premiums for participants for specified plans & coverage periods; provides appropriation & authorizes positions.
Title
State Group Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-31 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 8 |
2015-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5009 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |