FL H7097 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for future repeal of provisions relating to organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Support Organization of the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#291 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27 Chapter No. 2017-192
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-02SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateSubstituted for SB 7006
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2017-04-26SenateIn Messages
2017-04-26HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2017-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-20HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-04-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/20/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-03-29HouseIntroduced
2017-03-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7006 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback