FL H7101 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Local Government Efficiency Task Force within Legislature & Urban Core Crime & Violence Task Force within FDLE; provides for membership, duties, & meetings of task forces; requires reports; provides for expiration of task forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Advisory Bodies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#563 (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06SenateReceived
2020-03-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-03-06SenateIn Messages
2020-03-06HouseCS passed; YEAS 99 NAYS 5
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2020-02-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-25HouseCS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 5
2020-02-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/25/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-20HouseIntroduced
2020-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H201 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S652 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback