FL H7107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schedules certain drug product containing cannabidiol to Schedule V.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#221 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chapter No. 2019-166
2019-06-28 Approved by Governor
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for SB 7082
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-04-10HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7082 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7107 (Ch. 2019-166)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817563Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback