FL H7117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds factors for PSC to consider in reviewing 10-year site plans submitted to commission by electric utilities; provides for portion of proceeds of local government infrastructure surtax to be used for financial assistance to residential & commercial property owners who make energy efficiency improvements or install renewable energy devices; deletes obsolete directive to PSC to adopt rules for renewable portfolio standard; prohibits cultivation of certain algae in plantings greater in size than 2 contiguous acres; requires DOACS to conduct statewide forest inventory; provides appropriation from Florida Public Service Regulatory Trust Fund for purpose of PSC, in consultation with DOACS, to contract for independent evaluation of Florida Energy Efficiency and Conservation Act. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Energy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1169 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1061 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1061 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1260 | |
2012-03-09 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (771158) -HJ 1250 | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 2 -SJ 1080 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 1070 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 869 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 -HJ 1079 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1077 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1022 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 907 | |
2012-02-27 | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 853 | |
2012-02-27 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-24 | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-17 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-16 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 668 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-15 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -HJ 671 | |
2012-02-13 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/15/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 581 | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced -HJ 567 | |
2012-02-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 0613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 0614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |