FL H7131 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Irving Hoffman & Marjorie Weiss, parents of Rachel Hoffman, deceased, individually & as co-personal representatives of Estate of Rachel Hoffman, by City of Tallahassee; provides appropriation to compensate them for wrongful death of their daughter, Rachel Hoffman, who was murdered while serving as confidential informant for Tallahassee Police Dept.; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Irving Hoffman and Marjorie Weiss/City of Tallahassee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1155 (Y: 107 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1089 (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1155 (Y: 107 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1089 (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1718 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 3 -SJ 1190 | |
2012-03-09 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (525769) -SJ 1190 | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | Passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 11 -HJ 1189 | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (525769) -HJ 1189 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 4 -SJ 952 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 952 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Rules -SJ 866 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | Passed as amended; YEAS 99 NAYS 13 -HJ 1095 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1094 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1057 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced -HJ 847 | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 847 | |
2012-02-24 | Filed |