FL H8067 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honors Florida National Guard & designates March 3, 2020, as "Florida National Guard Day."
Title
Florida National Guard Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1926 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Adopted
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/8067 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/8067/BillText/Filed/PDF |