FL H9029 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Fort Myers Midtown Urban Infill Development Water Quality Planning Initiative.
Title
Fort Myers Midtown Urban Infill Development Water Quality Planning Initiative
Sponsors
Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/23/20, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/20, 8:30 am, Morris Hall -- Not Considered |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9029 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9029/BillText/Filed/PDF |