FL H9095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 452)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 452)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Heart of Florida United Way Orlando United Assistance Center (Heart of FL Pulse).
Title
Heart of Florida United Way Orlando United Assistance Center (Heart of FL Pulse)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 452) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 452) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-12-20 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9095 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9095/BillText/Filed/PDF |