FL S0022 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of the Justice-2-Jesus Charitable Trust; providing an appropriation to compensate the trust for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence and inaction of state government; providing a limitation on the payment of attorney fees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of the Justice-2-Jesus Charitable Trust by the State of Florida

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Special Master on Claim Bills
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-08-01SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback