FL S0026 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of the Estate of Danielle Maudsley; providing an appropriation to compensate the Estate of Danielle Maudsley for Ms. Maudsley's death, sustained as a result of the alleged negligence of Trooper Daniel Cole and the Florida Highway Patrol, a division of the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing a limitation on the payment of attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of the Estate of Danielle Maudsley/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/26 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/26/BillText/Filed/HTML |