FL S0028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Clifford Williams; providing an appropriation to compensate him for being wrongfully incarcerated for 43 years; directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant payable to an irrevocable trust for the benefit of Clifford Williams; providing that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's limits of liability; providing that certain benefits are vacated upon specified findings, etc.
Title
Relief of Clifford Williams by the State of Florida
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#643 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Received |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (819976) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Report Submitted by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6507 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 28 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |