FL S0046 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to create and make available electronically a pamphlet with specified information; requiring birth centers to provide the informational pamphlet to clients during postpartum care; requiring hospitals that provide birthing services to provide the informational pamphlet to parents during postpartum education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eye Care for Newborns and Infants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-18SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2020-02-12SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H67 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S190 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 81
H81 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-79

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560496Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback