FL S0048 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from performing a declawing on a cat within this state; providing an exception; providing that a veterinarian who performs a prohibited declawing is subject to disciplinary action by the Board of Veterinary Medicine, etc.
Title
Declawing of Cats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
474 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |