FL S0056 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the education and orientation requirements for birth centers and their families to incorporate safe sleep practices and causes of Sudden Unexpected Infant Death; revising legislative findings and intent with respect to the sudden unexpected death of an infant under a specified age; defining the term "Sudden Unexpected Infant Death"; revising provisions relating to training requirements for first responders; revising requirements relating to autopsies performed by medical examiners, etc.
Title
Infant Death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#187 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#187 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-62 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2013-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (924119) 886 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | In returning messages |
2013-04-18 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-18 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (924119) |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 83 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-15 | House | Received |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (296380) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (526840) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/12/13, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/13, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0083 (Similar To) 2013-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2013-62)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 3362 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |