FL S0056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising private school eligibility requirements for the state school choice scholarship program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private School Eligibility Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations; Rules
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H45 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback