FL S0066 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing that a health care practitioner's failure to repay a student loan or to comply with service scholarship obligations does not constitute grounds for disciplinary action; removing a civil fine; removing the requirement that the Department of Health investigate and prosecute health care practitioners for failing to repay a student loan or to comply with scholarship service obligations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Loans and Scholarship Obligations of Health Care Practitioners

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H77 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
H115 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
S356 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Referred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
S474 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback