FL S0076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 107 (Ch. 2019-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 107 (Ch. 2019-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from operating a motor vehicle while using a wireless communications device; authorizing a law enforcement officer during a specified period to stop motor vehicles to issue warnings to persons who are driving while using a wireless communications device; providing that a user's billing records for a wireless communications device or the testimony of or written statements from certain authorities are admissible as evidence in crashes involving serious bodily injury, etc.
Title
Driving While Using a Wireless Communications Device
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 107 (Ch. 2019-44) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 107 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/19/19, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H45 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 107 (Ch. 2019-44)
H107 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Chapter No. 2019-44
H107 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Chapter No. 2019-44