FL S0082 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting local governments from regulating vegetable gardens on residential properties except as otherwise provided by law; specifying that such regulations are void and unenforceable, etc.
Title
Vegetable Gardens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#344 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Chapter No. 2019-120 | |
2019-06-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 16 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | In Messages |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/14/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/06/19, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/08/19, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H145 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 82 (Ch. 2019-120)