FL S0084 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person who is licensed to provide professional counseling or a practitioner who is licensed under provisions regulating the practice of medicine, osteopathic medicine, psychology, clinical social work, marriage and family therapy, or mental health counseling from practicing or performing conversion therapy for an individual who is younger than a specified age; providing that such licensee or practitioner is subject to disciplinary proceedings by the Department of Health and the appropriate board under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conversion Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2018-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H109 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456064Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback