FL S0102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that recovery residences obtain certification by a specified date or before commencing operation; creating a criminal penalty for a person who operates a recovery residence without a certificate of compliance; requiring that recovery residence administrators be certified by a specified date or before beginning employment, etc.
Title
Recovery Residences
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H103 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
397 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/102 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/102/BillText/Filed/HTML |