FL S0104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Veterans' Affairs to establish the Florida Veterans' Care Coordination Program to provide for veterans and their families behavioral health care referral and care coordination services; requiring the department to contract with a certain nonprofit entity to enter into agreements with Florida 211 Network participants to provide such services; providing for the statewide delivery of specified services by program teams, etc.
Title
Services for Veterans and Their Families
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 10/22/19, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H687 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/104 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/104/BillText/Filed/HTML |