FL S0114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "petitioner" to include an individual who has a biological or legal parent-child relationship with, who is a legal guardian of, or who is a spouse or sibling of a respondent, etc.
Title
Risk Protection Orders
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H47 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/114 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/114/BillText/Filed/HTML |